IL HB0763 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-002-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Provides for specified financial commitment reporting requirements for completion of projects under the Act. Removes reviewing organizations other than State Board staff from the requirement of making any written review or findings concerning an application for a permit available to the public at least 14 calendar days before the meeting of the State Board at which the review or findings are considered. Provides that substantive projects under the Act, in addition to other specified substantive projects, shall include discontinuation of a State-owned healthcare facility (currently, discontinuation of service within an existing healthcare facility) and relocation of an end stage renal facility. Provides that a State Board Staff Report shall pertain to applications for extension of the financial commitment period (currently, obligation period), in addition to other specified applications. Defines "financial commitment". Makes other technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH FACILITIES-STATE BOARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-002-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. William Davis
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 006-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-13SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-021-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20396012Amended CodeCitation Text
2039603Amended CodeCitation Text
2039604.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2039605Amended CodeCitation Text
2039605.4Amended CodeCitation Text
2039606Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback