IL HB0762 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0565
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0565
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Removes the requirement that a person listed on the Health Care Worker Registry who requests a waiver of the prohibition against employment must show that he or she has paid all outstanding fines. Effective immediately.
Title
HLTH CARE WRKR BKGRND CHK ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-18 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0565 | |
2009-08-18 | Effective Date August 18, 2009 | |
2009-08-18 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Labor; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-28 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Labor | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-26 | Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Public Health | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-027-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor Committee; 025-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Labor Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard |