IL HB0759 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In a provision concerning licensure requirements for financial institutions, provides that nothing in a provision concerning limited lines producer licenses in the Code shall be construed to require a limited lines producer license or any other form or class of producer's license for financial institutions, or their employees, if the financial institution has purchased or sponsored a group or individual credit life, credit accident and health, credit casualty, credit property, or other credit insurance policy or program under which the financial institution enrolls or performs other administrative services to enable individuals to purchase insurance coverage under the group or individual credit insurance policy from a licensed producer in compliance with provisions concerning license exceptions and credit life and credit accident and health insurance policies under the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-PRODUCER LICENSE-BANKS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Financial Institutions Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
2017-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21551403Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback