IL HB0745 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that the personal identity and address of a scholarship, grant, or other financial assistance applicant or recipient under a non-discretionary program administered by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission (instead of under a non-discretionary program administered by the Commission where eligibility data is obtained from the Free Application for Federal Student Aid or is protected from disclosure under federal or State law or under rules and regulations implementing federal or State law) is information that is intended to remain private and shall be exempt from inspection and copying under the Freedom of Information Act. Specifies that this provision does not apply to the publication of the names of State Scholars or information disclosed in the aggregate in which a person's identity cannot be determined. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0596 |
2019-12-06 | House | Effective Date December 6, 2019 |
2019-12-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-12-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 13, 2019 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-10-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-024-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-10-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 78 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |