IL HB0744 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution may be commenced at any time when the victim is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense for: solicitation to meet a child, child pornography, posting of identifying or graphic information on a pornographic Internet site or possessing graphic information with pornographic material, non-consensual dissemination of private sexual images, grooming, or traveling to meet a minor.
Title
CRIM CD-LIMITATION-SEX OFFENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=744&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0744.htm |