IL HB0740 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that a community mental health or developmental services agency shall collect and securely store identifying and contact information for each individual resident. Provides that this information may include, but not be limited to, a current photograph, personal contact information, guardian or emergency contact information, and a log of all off-site overnight visits. Provides that this information shall be updated periodically. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CILA-EMERGENCY CONTACTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2101359.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback