IL HB0738 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Modifies the term "public employee" or "employee" to explicitly exclude all existing and future position numbers of any employee of the Department of Human Services who is classified as or who holds the position of Public Service Administrator (Option 8N) or Internal Security Investigator II, for the purposes of the Act and contracts negotiated or entered into under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
LABOR-DHS EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=738&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0738.htm |