IL HB0727 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery to offer a special instant scratch-off game to benefit homeless shelters. Requires the net revenue from that game to be deposited into the Homeless Shelter Revenue Fund. Provides that moneys deposited into the Homeless Shelter Revenue Fund shall be used by the Department of Human Services to fund grants to homeless shelters. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Defines "net revenue". Amends the State Finance Act to create the Homeless Shelter Revenue Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-HOMELESS SHELTERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016052Amended CodeCitation Text
20160520Amended CodeCitation Text
20160521.10New CodeSee Bill Text
2016059.1Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback