IL HB0725 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Park District Code. Provides that a commissioner of a park district board shall not be elected to more than 2 terms. Further provides that the 2-term limit does not apply to a term where a commissioner is elected to a 6-year term but only serves a 2-year term as prescribed by statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARK DIST-COMMISSIONER TERMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseRemains in Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-28HouseMotion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Cities & Villages Committee; 007-006-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7012052-12Amended CodeCitation Text
7012052-12aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback