IL HB0724 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that any contract with a third party to provide claim services for a property and casualty company must contain specified language that provides that upon liquidation or rehabilitation of the insurer, the files and related data become the sole property of the estate with the administrator having reasonable access and right to copy files; provides that the requirement shall apply to all contracts entered into after the effective date, and any existing contracts shall have one year to comply with the requirement. In provisions concerning the distribution of general assets of a company's estate that is undergoing liquidation, rehabilitation, or conservation proceedings: Prioritizes costs and expenses of administration, including the reasonable expenses of certain funds and associations, but excluding certain other expenses, and the expenses expressly approved or ratified by the Director of Insurance as liquidator or rehabilitator, including specified costs and expenses, over all other claims. Provides that claims of obligees under surety bonds and undertakings, claims by principals under surety bonds and surety undertakings for wrongful dissipation of collateral by the insurer or its agents, and claims incurred during certain extensions of coverage are granted the same priority level as claims by policyholders, beneficiaries, and insureds, under insurance policies, annuity contracts, and funding agreements. Provides that these changes apply to all pending and future liquidation, rehabilitation, or conservation proceedings. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-LIQUIDATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 141b | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=724&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0724.htm |