IL HB0714 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may not impose a tax, fee, or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition. Provides that the provisions of any ordinance or resolution, in effect or adopted, on or after the effective date of the bill by any unit of local government, including a home rule unit, that imposes a tax, fee, or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods on a firearm, firearm attachment, or firearm ammunition are invalid and void. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OWNERS ID-LOCAL REG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306513.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback