IL HB0709 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, in consultation with other specified State agencies, to conduct a public information campaign to educate immigrants, refugees, asylum seekers, and other noncitizens residing in Illinois of their rights under the U.S. Constitution and Illinois laws that apply regardless of immigration status. Requires the public information campaign to include resources and contact information for organizations that can aid residents in protecting and enforcing these rights. Requires the Department of Human Services, in consultation with the Department of Transportation and other agencies, when necessary, to post resources and other information regarding immigrant, refugee, and asylum seekers' rights in high-traffic public areas, including, but not limited to, train stations, airports, and highway rest stops. Permits the Department of Human Services to adopt rules or joint rules with other agencies to implement the requirements of the amendatory Act.
Title
DHS-IMMIGRANT RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0408 |
2021-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-015-000 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Human Rights; 006-003-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Rights |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 083-024-001 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |