IL HB0709 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In the Article concerning the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, makes changes to the organization of provisions concerning coverage and limitations and powers and duties of the Association. Makes changes in the provisions concerning definitions; the Board of Directors of the Association; assessments; and miscellaneous provisions. In a provision concerning duties of the Director of Insurance as liquidator, provides that upon the entry of an order directing liquidation of a company, the Director may, subject to a provision of the Insurance Code that allows the Association to exercise all the rights of the Director with respect to covered policies after the Association becomes obligated by statute or a provision of the Health Maintenance Organization Act, cede or reinsure all or so much as may be necessary of the in-force business to another company using assets of the liquidated company to pay therefor in preference to satisfying other obligations or creditors. Effective immediately.
Title
INS-LIFE AND HEALTH GUARANTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=709&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0709.htm |