IL HB0707 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning coverage for telehealth services, provides that if an individual or group policy of accident or health insurance provides coverage for telehealth services, reimbursement for services provided through telehealth services shall be equivalent to reimbursement for the same services provided through in-person consultation.
Title
TELEHEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] |
Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | To Special Issues (INS) Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=707&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0707.htm |