IL HB0706 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act. Provides that in the absence of a police officer, State Police officer, coroner, or medical examiner at the scene of a death, a nurse or physician may dispose of unused medication found at the scene while engaging in the performance of his or her duties. Provides that anyone authorized to dispose of unused medications under the Act, and his or her employer, employees, or agents shall incur no civil liability, criminal liability, or professional discipline, except for willful or wanton misconduct, as a result of any injury arising from his or her good faith disposal or non-disposal of unused medication. Defines "nurse" and "physician". Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987 and the Nurse Practice Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PHARMA DISPOSAL-DOCTORS-NURSES
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0345 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2017-03-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-24 | House | To Tort Liability Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 150 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 150 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 50-41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 50-80 | New Code | See Bill Text |