IL HB0705 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of the Code to the contrary, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services' Inspector General shall report all suspected cases of provider fraud involving a vendor, a medical provider, or any other provider authorized to participate in the medical assistance program to the State's Attorney of the county where the alleged fraud occurred or, when appropriate, to the Office of the Attorney General or to the Offices of the several United States Attorneys in Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-VENDOR FRAUD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | To Public Benefits Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=705&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0705.htm |