IL HB0703 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Adoption Act. In a Section concerning adoption between multiple jurisdictions, adds a statement of public policy. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall promulgate procedures and requirements for interstate adoption placements of children and disseminate the information via specified channels no later than 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the Department may not require any further pre-adoption requirements. Provides that the procedures shall reflect the standard of review as stated in the Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children and approval shall be given by the Department if the placement appears not to be contrary to the best interests of the child. Adds provisions governing the timeline and procedures for interstate adoptions. Provides that communications concerning an interstate placement made between the Department and an Illinois licensed child welfare agency, an out-of-state child placing agency, and attorneys representing the prospective adoptive parent or biological parent may be made through any type of electronic means, including, but not limited to, electronic mail. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INTERSTATE ADOPTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 1, 2017
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
750504.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback