IL HB0697 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to 50% of the contributions made by the taxpayer during the taxable year to one or more qualifying pregnancy resource centers. Provides that the term "qualifying pregnancy resource center" means a nonprofit organization that is exempt from taxation under Section 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code and is established for the purpose of providing free assistance to pregnant women in carrying their pregnancies to term.
Title
INC TX-PREGNANCY RESOURCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-03-11 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=697&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0697.htm |