IL HB0697 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Creates local school councils for charter schools in Chicago. Provides for the initial and subsequent appointment of members of the councils, and imposes certain limitations on members. Provides for non-binding, advisory polls of teachers at charter schools to choose teacher members of the council. Allows for the filling of vacant positions on the councils. Provides for non-binding, advisory polls for the appointment of student members of the councils. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CHARTER SCH-LOCAL SCH COUNCIL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=697&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0697.htm |