IL HB0691 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Petroleum Equipment Contractors Licensing Act. Provides that, if a corporation or business entity does not have evidence of current registration, such as a Secretary of State issued Certificate of Good Standing, the Office of the State Fire Marshal has the authority to deny or revoke the license of such a corporation or business entity. Provides that a lapsed license may not be reinstated until an application (rather than a written application) is filed. Removes language providing that, if a license or certificate is lost, a duplicate shall be issued upon payment of the required fee. Removes language providing that licensees shall be subject to disciplinary action for being a habitual drunk or having a habitual addiction to the use of morphine, cocaine, controlled substances, or other habit-forming drugs. Allows the Office of the State Fire Marshal to adopt rules to permit the issuance of citations for certain violations of the Act or the rules adopted under the Act. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Petroleum Equipment Contractors Licensing Act from January 1, 2022 to January 1, 2032. Effective January 1, 2022, except provisions amending the Regulatory Sunset Act take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PETROLEUM EQUIPMENT CONTRACTOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2022-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2022-04-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2022-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive
2022-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2022-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2022-04-01SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
2022-03-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2022-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-005-000
2022-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2022-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2022-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2022-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022
2022-03-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-07-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2021-06-15SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021
2021-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
2021-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2021-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2021-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-05-28SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert Peters
2021-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
2021-05-13SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021
2021-05-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 017-000-000
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-04-28SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-04-16HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-11HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Police & Fire Committee; 015-000-000
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Police & Fire Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22572935Amended CodeCitation Text
22572945Amended CodeCitation Text
22572960Amended CodeCitation Text
22572965Amended CodeCitation Text
22572973New CodeSee Bill Text
5804.32Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback