IL HB0685 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that counties and municipalities may not classify milkweed as a noxious or exotic weed. Limits home rule powers.
Title
CLASSIFY MILKWEED-CNTY & MUNI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0557 |
2017-12-08 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-12-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-12-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-11-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-006-001 |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 018-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1057.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-20-6.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |