IL HB0679 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Communicable Disease Prevention Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall develop an informational brochure relating to meningococcal disease that contains specified information. Provides that the Department shall make the brochure available on its website and shall notify every public institution of higher education in the State of the availability of the brochure. Provides that each public institution of higher education shall provide a copy of the brochure to all students and if the student is under 18 years of age, to the student's parent or guardian.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-MENINGOCOCCAL BROCHURE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0342
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Public Health; 006-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-02-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4103151.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback