IL HB0665 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Limitations on Actions for Negligent Hiring Act. Provides that a cause of action may not be brought against a party solely for hiring an employee or independent contractor who has been convicted of a nonviolent, non-sexual offense. Provides that in a negligent hiring action for the acts of an employee or independent contractor, the fact that the employee or independent contractor was convicted of a nonviolent, non-sexual offense before the beginning of the employee's or independent contractor's employment or contractual obligation may not be introduced into evidence. Provides that the new provisions do not preclude any existing cause of action for failure of an employer or other person to provide adequate supervision of an employee or independent contractor, except that the fact that the employee or independent contractor has been convicted of a nonviolent, non-sexual criminal offense may be introduced into evidence in the suit only if: (1) the employer knew of the conviction or was grossly negligent in not knowing of the conviction; and (2) the conviction was directly related to the nature of the employee's or independent contractor's work and the conduct that gave rise to the alleged injury that is the basis of the suit. Provides exceptions in certain situations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NEGLIGENT HIRING-LIMITATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-03-14HouseTo Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee
2017-03-08HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 To Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback