IL HB0663 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. If any payments from this State to a school district are delayed for at least one payment cycle, then allows the school board to discontinue, by publicly adopted resolution, any instructional mandate in the Courses of Study Article of the School Code during that time (with exceptions). Provides that if a student requests information on any instructional mandate that has been discontinued, then the school district shall provide the student with the requested information. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-INSTRUCTIONAL MANDATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-2.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback