IL HB0662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Establishes the registration fee for electric vehicles at no more than $216.00 per year (previously $35 for a 2-year term) and creates a separate registration fee not to exceed $158.50 per year for hybrid vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-ELECTRIC LICENSE FEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Lost 004-003-000
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-04-13HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-002-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-805Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback