IL HB0661 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the registration period and fee for electric vehicles shall be the same as the registration period and fee for non-electric motor vehicles (rather than $35 for a 2-year registration period).
Title
VEH CD-ELECTRIC VEH-PLATE FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Lost 004-003-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-002-000 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |