IL HB0656 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-19)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-19)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision relating to employer contributions from special trust and federal funds, provides that, beginning July 1, 2017, the rate, expressed as a percentage of salary, shall be equal to the total employer's normal cost, expressed as a percentage of payroll. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TRS-TRUST FUND CONTRIBS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0340 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-001-000 |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-02-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |