IL HB0656 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-19)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision relating to employer contributions from special trust and federal funds, provides that, beginning July 1, 2017, the rate, expressed as a percentage of salary, shall be equal to the total employer's normal cost, expressed as a percentage of payroll. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRS-TRUST FUND CONTRIBS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0340
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-001-000
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback