IL HB0651 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that no person shall knowingly use cash assistance benefits provided under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program for the payment of bail ordered by a court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF-BAIL PAYMENT PROHIBITION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Public Benefits Subcommittee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30554-8aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback