IL HB0649 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Unified Code of Corrections concerning defendants found unfit to stand trial and found not guilty by reason of insanity. Provides that if the court orders the defendant placed in the custody of the Department of Human Services, the Department shall evaluate the defendant to determine to which secure facility the defendant shall be transported and, within 7 days of the entry of the placement order, notify the sheriff of the designated facility. Upon receipt of that notice, the sheriff shall promptly transport the defendant to the designated facility. Provides that if, within 7 days of the entry of the placement order, the Department fails to notify the sheriff of the identity of the facility to which the defendant shall be transported, the sheriff shall notify the Department that the defendant will be transported to the nearest secure mental health facility operated by the Department unless, within 24 hours of receiving the notice, the Department notifies the sheriff that the defendant should be transported to another facility. Provides that if, during this 24-hour period the Department notifies the sheriff of another facility, the sheriff shall transport the defendant to that facility. If the notice is not received, the sheriff shall transport the defendant to the nearest secure mental health facility operated by the Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-DHS PLACEMENT-DEFNDT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255104-17Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-2-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback