IL HB0647 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. In provisions regarding the handling of bulk food: replaces references to personal containers with references to consumer-owned containers; provides that clean consumer-owned containers provided or returned to a restaurant or retailer for filling may be filled and returned to the same consumer if the consumer-owned container is filled by either an employee of the restaurant or retailer or the owner of the consumer-owned container; requires consumer-owned containers filled to be designed and constructed for reuse in accordance with a specified provision of the 2017 Food Code; and requires restaurants and retailers to meet specified requirements. Provides that consumer-owned containers that are not food-specific may be filled at a beverage vending machine or system. Requires the Department of Public Health, on or before January 1, 2022, to produce materials for restaurants and retailers indicating that consumer-owned containers are not prohibited for use under Illinois law and specifying best practices for food safety requirements for such containers. Effective immediately.
Title
FOOD & DRUG-CONTAINERS
Sponsors
Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | To Product Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 620 | 3.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=647&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0647.htm |