IL HB0647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for an employer to refuse to make certain reasonable accommodations in the workplace for an employee protected under an order of protection. Provides that an employer is not required to make the reasonable accommodations if they cause undue hardship on the work operations of the employer. For purposes of the new provisions, defines "undue hardship" as significant difficulty or expense on the operation of an employer, when considered in light of: (1) the nature and cost of the reasonable accommodation needed; (2) the overall financial resources, number of employees, and the number, type, and placement of the work locations of an employer; and (3) the type of operation of the employer, including the composition, structure, and functions of the workforce of the employer, the geographic separateness of the employee's work location from the employer, and the administrative or fiscal relationship of the work location to the employer. Provides that prior to making the reasonable accommodations, an employer may verify that an employee is protected by an order of protection entered under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 or the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-PROTECTION ORDERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-004-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-004-000 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-002-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-24 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |