IL HB0641 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill, but replaces the term "feminine hygiene products" with the term "menstrual hygiene products". Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-FEMININE HYGIENE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0250 |
2021-08-05 | House | Effective Date August 5, 2021 |
2021-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 074-037-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-013-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 009-004-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-031-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000 |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-220 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |