IL HB0626 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that the Office of the Secretary of State and the State Board of Elections shall jointly establish an automatic voter registration program. Provides that designated automatic voter registration agencies may agree to participate in an automatic voter registration program established by the State Board of Elections. Provides that the term "designated automatic voter registration agency" means an agency of the State or federal government that has been determined by the State Board of Elections to have access to reliable personal information and has entered into an interagency contract with the State Board of Elections to participate in the automatic voter registration program. Provides for dual purpose applications, and provides that an application for a driver's license or a State identification card shall be a dual-purpose application. Provides that if an election authority is required by law to send an election-related notice to an individual, that election authority may send that notice solely by electronic mail if the individual provides a current e-mail address to the election authority and authorizes the election authority to send notices by electronic mail. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that certain information specified in the amendatory Act is exempt from inspection and copying. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-VOTER REGISTRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseTo Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-16New CodeSee Bill Text
1051A-16.1New CodeSee Bill Text
1051A-16.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1051A-16.6Amended CodeCitation Text
1051A-16.7New CodeSee Bill Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback