IL HB0626 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Provides that an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan must provide coverage for intravenous feeding, prescription nutritional supplements, and physician prescribed or ordered pain medication. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State.
Title
INS-VARIOUS HEALTH COVERAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Standard Debate Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee; 007-005-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=626&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0626.htm |