IL HB0623 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Comptroller Act. Requires the Comptroller to make a listing of State employee salaries, in both the annual report and the online ledger, in which the total amount paid to a State employee during the past calendar year is listed as rounded to the nearest thousand dollar. Provides findings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPTROLLER ACT-SALARY REPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1540520Amended CodeCitation Text
1540527Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback