IL HB0622 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that for each rule proposed to be adopted by the State Board of Education impacting the operations of any school district, any interested person may request the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules to determine whether the proposed rule is a State mandate. Provides that if the Joint Committee determines that the proposed rule is a State mandate, then the running of all periods under the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act shall be tolled, and no Certificate of No Objection may be issued for the rule, until the rule has been approved by a joint resolution of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
ISBE-RULES-UNFUNDED MANDATES
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-06-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=622&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0622.htm |