IL HB0622 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that the filing of an appeal in the Appellate Court to obtain judicial review of an order of the Illinois Labor Relations Board shall not automatically stay the enforcement of the Board's order. Provides that an aggrieved party may apply to the Appellate Court for a stay of the enforcement of the Board's order after providing notice to the Board and the prevailing party or parties, and may be granted a stay of enforcement after making a showing of good cause in accordance with the Administrative Review Law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR RELATIONS-STAY ON APPEAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-29HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-29House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-004-000
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-06-24House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Lost 061-030-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 017-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-001-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-047-000
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531511Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback