IL HB0618 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Authorizes an active member of a downstate firefighters' pension fund to transfer up to 6 years of creditable service to that fund from the downstate police pension fund that is administered by the same unit of local government. Requires application within 6 months after the effective date. Authorizes reinstatement of service that was terminated by a refund. Provides that if the transferred police service was Tier 1, then the firefighter shall be considered to be a Tier 1 firefighter. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TRANSFER DNST POL-FIRE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-013-000
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-09HouseRemains in Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-09HouseMotion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-007-000
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-110.12New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-108Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback