IL HB0617 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-15)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-15)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act, the Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Emergency Telephone System Act, the Riverboat Gambling Act, and the Video Gaming Act. Provides that, in the absence of an appropriation for any State fiscal year, moneys that are required to be distributed to units of local government and other entities from the State and Local Sales Tax Reform Fund, the Motor Fuel Tax Fund, the State Gaming Fund, the Local Government Video Gaming Distributive Fund, and the Statewide 9-1-1 Fund are subject to a continuing appropriation. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC-MOTOR FUEL-LOCAL GOV
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-01-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-24 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 750 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=617&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0617.htm |