IL HB0617 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Athletic Trainers Practice Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2013-04-19HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2013-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2013-02-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2013-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2013-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22552Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback