IL HB0598 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $20,000,000 to the Department of Human Services to provide grants to county sheriffs, $10,000,000 for mental health and substance use disorder treatment for prisoners incarcerated in county jails and $10,000,000 for job reentry training and transportation to training sites of prisoners incarcerated in county jails. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$DHS-JAILS-MENTAL HLTH & JOB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-19 | House | To Special Issues (AP) Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=598&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB0598.pdf |