IL HB0581 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Hospital Emergency Service Act. Provides that "applicant" includes any person who presents at the hospital. Provides that hospitals shall furnish hospital emergency services in accordance with the procedures required by the federal Emergency Medical Treatment and Active Labor Act. Defines "injury or acute medical condition where the same is liable to cause death or severe injury or serious illness" and "stabilizing treatment". Provides that the Department of Public Health shall have the authority to investigate violations of the Act and to issue a minimum monetary penalty of $50,000 for violating the Act. Allows the Department to adopt rules for purposes of enforcing the Act and identifying factors to be considered when issuing a monetary penalty. Provides that the Department may assess a fine under this Section only if there are no fines assessed for the violation by the federal government. Includes a severability clause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13HouseSent to the Governor
2024-05-26HousePassed Both Houses
2024-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2024-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-019-000
2024-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
2024-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
2024-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2024-05-23SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-004-000
2024-05-23SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
2024-05-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2024-05-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-23SenateAssigned to Executive
2024-05-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-05-21SenateFirst Reading
2024-05-21SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2024-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 21, 2024
2024-05-21SenateArrive in Senate
2024-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
2024-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
2024-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
2024-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
2024-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2024-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2024-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2024-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-036-000
2024-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2024-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-05-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2024-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
2024-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2024-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2024-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
2024-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
2024-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
2024-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2024-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
2024-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-002-000
2024-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2024-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 007-004-000
2024-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2024-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2024-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
2024-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2024-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2024-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
2024-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2024-05-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
2024-05-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
2024-05-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
2024-05-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2024-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2024-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-05-14HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-05-14HouseThird Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
2024-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2023-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2023-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2023-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2023-02-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2022-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210761Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback