IL HB0576 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Provides that the child, after the second mental health day used, may be referred to the appropriate school support personnel.
Title
SCH CD-ABSENCE-MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0266 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martwick |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 26-2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |