IL HB0536 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Fiscal Note Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Transportation Article of the School Code. Provides that each school board may provide free transportation for any pupil residing within 1 1/2 miles from the school attended where conditions are such that walking, either to or from the school to which a pupil is assigned for attendance or to or from a pick-up point or bus stop, constitutes a serious hazard to the safety of the pupil due to a course or pattern of criminal activity, as defined in the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act. Provides for the adoption of guidelines by the local law enforcement agency as to what constitutes a serious safety hazard due to a course or pattern of criminal activity. Provides that the State Board of Education, in consultation with the local law enforcement agency, shall review the findings of the school board concerning a course or pattern of criminal activity and shall approve or disapprove the school board's determination that a serious safety hazard exists within 30 days after the school board submits its findings to the State Board. Authorizes the local law enforcement agency to determine what constitutes a course or pattern of criminal activity. Makes related changes. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act do not apply to the Chicago school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TRANSPORTATION-HAZARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-002-000
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105529-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback