IL HB0534 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Director of Natural Resources to exchange described parcels of real estate in Lake County for another parcel of described real estate in Lake County. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR-CONVEY REAL ESTATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-23HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-23House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 100-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback