IL HB0529 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning expenses of conducting a primary election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-03-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1057-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback