IL HB0524 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act. Provides that pharmaceuticals disposed of under the Act may be destroyed in a drug destruction device. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Expands the definition of "drug evidence" to include any used, expired, or unwanted pharmaceuticals collected under the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SAFE PHARMACEUTICAL DISPOSAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0250 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2017 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Police & First Responders Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Police & First Responders Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Police & First Responders Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Police & First Responders Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & First Responders Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Police & First Responders Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 150 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 22.58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |