IL HB0523 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mortgage Foreclosure Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that provisions concerning an additional fee paid by residential foreclosure plaintiffs are operative until January 1, 2020 (instead of January 1, 2018). Provides that provisions concerning an additional fee paid by purchasers at a judicial sale are operative and become inoperative on January 1, 2020 (instead of January 1, 2017). Repeals the Section on March 2, 2020 (instead of March 2, 2017). Provides that specified actions taken before the effective date of the amendatory Act are ratified, validated, and confirmed. Effective immediately.
Title
ABANDONED RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-004-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-006-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-24 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 15-1504.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 15-1507.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |