IL HB0514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that records of charges that result in an acquittal or dismissal with prejudice, except for minor traffic offenses, may be immediately sealed after the final disposition of the case. Provides that upon entry of judgment, the defendant shall be informed of this right and the proper procedures to follow to have records that are eligible be immediately sealed. Provides that the petition may be filed on behalf of the defendant by his or her attorney at the final disposition hearing, or by the defendant at any time. Provides that the State's Attorney may not object to an immediate sealing petition and the presiding trial judge shall enter an order granting or denying the petition during the hearing in which the petition is filed. Provides that no fees shall be charged by the circuit court clerk or the Department of State Police for processing petitions filed under this provision. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-IMMEDIATE SEALING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-24HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0282
2017-08-24HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-24HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-013-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 008-002-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-040-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-003-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback